blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0967524


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.07.2008 Withdrawal of application published on  27.08.2008  [2008/35]
23.11.2007 Change: Renewal fee paid
23.11.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.11.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.01.2006 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
24.01.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.12.2005 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
22.11.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.11.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.11.2002 Renewal fee
27.11.2001 Renewal fee
28.09.2001 Change - representative published on  14.11.2001 [2001/46]
21.11.2000 Renewal fee
04.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  20.09.2000 [2000/38]
14.07.2000 Request for examination filed published on  30.08.2000 [2000/35]
19.11.1999 Publication of search report published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
12.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.12.1999 [1999/52]
01.11.1999 Renewal fee