blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0967524

Designated contracting statesDE 
FR 
GB 
IT 
NL 
Examination procedure18.07.2008Application withdrawn by applicant  [2008/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 10
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 11
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 12
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 13
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 14
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 15
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 16
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 17
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200515   M06   Fee paid on   12.01.2006
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:29.12.1999 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:486316
Country of Ref Document:EP
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:29.12.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:30.08.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000630
 
Event date:20.09.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:27.08.2008 
Event description:APPLICATION WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20080718
 
Event date:26.06.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK WD 1024533 HK
Code Expl.:-APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG