Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0967524

EP0967524 - Projection exposure method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.07.2008
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/52]For all designated states
Nikon Corporation
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shiraishi, Naomasa
11-6-F204, Shinsaku 5-chome, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1999/52]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/46]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [1999/52]Spaargaren, Jerome , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date99203179.915.11.1991
[1999/52]
Priority number, dateJP1990030945815.11.1990         Original published format: JP 30945890
JP1990030945915.11.1990         Original published format: JP 30945990
JP1990040809327.12.1990         Original published format: JP 40809390
JP1990040809427.12.1990         Original published format: JP 40809490
JP1990040809527.12.1990         Original published format: JP 40809590
JP1990040809627.12.1990         Original published format: JP 40809690
[1999/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0967524
Date:29.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0967524
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/20, G02B27/00
[1999/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1999/52]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Projektionsbelichtung[1999/52]
English:Projection exposure method and apparatus[1999/52]
French:Méthode et appareil de projection pour exposition[1999/52]
Examination procedure30.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
18.07.2008Application withdrawn by applicant  [2008/35]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP91310550.8  / EP0486316
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 10
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 11
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 12
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 13
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 14
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 15
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 16
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 17
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200515   M06   Fee paid on   12.01.2006
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0352975  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [DA] 1,20,33-46 * page 4, line 1 - page 9, line 33 * * figure - *;
 [A]US3776633  (FROSCH A, et al) [A] 39-42,44 * column 4, line 8 - column 5, line 2 * * figures 3,4; claims 1,3 *;
 [A]  - "EXTENDED FOCAL DEPTH OPTICAL MICROLITHOGRAPHY", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19890601), vol. 32, no. 1, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 125 - 127, XP000033309 [A] 43 * the whole document *