Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993043

EP0993043 - Semiconductor package and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.07.2007
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
7839 Churchill Way
Dallas, Texas 75251 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
7839 Churchill Way
Dallas, Texas 75251 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Amagai, Masazumi
4260 Aza
Hiji, Oita / JP
02 / Yew, Chee Kiang
Bik. 866
04-313 Woodlands, St. 83 / SG
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Holt, Michael
Texas Instruments Limited
European Patent Department
3rd Floor
401 Grafton Gate
Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Holt, Michael
Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive
Northampton NN4 7YL / GB
Former [2000/15]Holt, Michael
Texas Instruments Limited, P.O. Box 5069
Northampton NN4 7ZE / GB
Application number, filing date99203181.529.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateSG1998000320729.09.1998         Original published format: SG 9803207
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0993043
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0993043
Date:24.08.2005
[2005/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2005
ClassificationInternational:H01L23/498
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/20]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Halbleiterverpackung und deren Herstellungsverfahren[2000/15]
English:Semiconductor package and method of manufacturing the same[2000/15]
French:Empaquetage de semiconducteur et son procédé de fabrication[2000/15]
Examination procedure24.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/16]
28.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.02.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/32]
16.03.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
02.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0810655  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [Y] 1-4,7-18,20 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19712551  (LG SEMICON CO LTD [KR]) [A] 20 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH1098130  ;
 [A]JPH0936167  ;
 [A]US5739585  (AKRAM SALMAN [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]US5753974  (MASUKAWA FUMINORI [JP]) [A] * the whole document *
 [DY]  - AMAGAI M ET AL, "The effect of polyimide surface morphology and chemistry on package cracking induced by interfacial delamination", RELIABILITY PHYSICS SYMPOSIUM, 1994. 32ND ANNUAL PROCEEDINGS., IEEE INTERNATIONAL SAN JOSE, CA, USA 11-14 APRIL 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19940411), ISBN 0-7803-1357-7, pages 101 - 107, XP010117230 [DY] 1-4,7-18,20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RELPHY.1994.307850
 [DA]  - MATIENZO L J ET AL, "ADHESION ISSUES IN ELECTRONIC PACKAGING", SOLID STATE TECHNOLOGY, COWAN PUBL.CORP. PORT WASHINGTON, NY, US, (19950701), vol. 38, no. 7, ISSN 0038-111X, pages 99 - 100,102, XP000523397 [DA] 1,16,20 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, [A] 1,9,10,16,20 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, [A] 1,7,8 * the whole document *