EP0993768 - A method of automatically milking animals and a fully automatic milking machine provided with a milking robot, said milking machine being suitable for performing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAASLAND N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [2000/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van der Lely, Olaf 11 Weinbergstrasse 6300 Zug / CH | 02 /
de Groen, Franciscus Johannes Adrianus 27 Koolwitje 3225 CB Hellevoetsluis / NL | 03 /
Pols, Ronald Maarten 25A High Street Waltham on the Wolds LE14 4AH / GB | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1 3147 PB Maassluis / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | Application number, filing date | 99203213.6 | 01.10.1999 | [2000/16] | Priority number, date | NL19981010323 | 15.10.1998 Original published format: NL 1010323 | [2000/16] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0993768 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0993768 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A01J5/017, A01J5/007 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
A01J5/007 (EP,US);
A01J5/0175 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum automatischen Melken von Tieren und eine vollautomatische Melkmaschine mit einem Melkroboter, die geeignet ist dieses Verfahren auszuführen | [2000/16] | English: | A method of automatically milking animals and a fully automatic milking machine provided with a milking robot, said milking machine being suitable for performing same | [2000/16] | French: | Méthode de traite automatique d'animaux et machine à traire entièrement automatique équipée d'un robot de traite, ladite machine convenant pour la mise en oeuvre de ladite méthode | [2000/16] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 12.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.08.2003 | BE | 20.08.2003 | CH | 20.08.2003 | FI | 20.08.2003 | IT | 20.08.2003 | LI | 20.08.2003 | CY | 01.10.2003 | IE | 01.10.2003 | LU | 01.10.2003 | MC | 31.10.2003 | GR | 20.11.2003 | ES | 01.12.2003 | PT | 20.01.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2005/03] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
BE | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
CY | 01.10.2003 | ||
IE | 01.10.2003 | ||
LU | 01.10.2003 | ||
MC | 31.10.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
ES | 01.12.2003 | ||
PT | 20.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
BE | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
CY | 01.10.2003 | ||
LU | 01.10.2003 | ||
MC | 31.10.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
ES | 01.12.2003 | ||
PT | 20.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
BE | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
CY | 01.10.2003 | ||
LU | 01.10.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
ES | 01.12.2003 | ||
PT | 20.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
BE | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
CY | 01.10.2003 | ||
LU | 01.10.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
PT | 20.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
BE | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
CY | 01.10.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
PT | 20.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
BE | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
PT | 20.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
BE | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 20.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3783837 (OLANDER K) [A] 10 * figure -; claim - *; | [DA]EP0091892 (ALFA LAVAL AB [SE]) [DA] 1,11 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US5469808 (STREET MICHAEL J [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,11 * figure -; claim - *; | [DA]WO9535028 (MAASLAND NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1,11* figure -; claim - *; | [X]WO9619915 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH], et al) [X] 1-6,8,11 * page 6, line 3 - page 7, line 35 * * figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP0728413 (MAASLAND NV [NL]) [X] 1-4,7,8,11 * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 44 * * column 4, line 27 - line 33 * * figure -; claim - *; | [X]WO9713403 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,11 * page 10, line 4 - line 10 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0792579 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) [A] 1,9-11 * column 6, line 36 - column 7, line 23 * * figure -; claim - * |