Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971531

EP0971531 - Network system in which a plurality of image processing apparatuses are connected [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.10.2007  [2007/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2006/39]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sakai, Akihiko
Canon K. K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Suzuki, Tadashi
Canon K. K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Sakai, Masanori
Canon K. K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Kutsuwada, Satoru
Canon K. K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / Yamamoto, Masahito
Canon K. K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
06 / Abe, Yoshinori
Canon K. K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
07 / Kurahashi, Masahiro
Canon K. K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
08 / Kaneko, Satoshi
Canon K. K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date99203221.918.04.1995
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateJP1994008071219.04.1994         Original published format: JP 8071294
JP1994008201020.04.1994         Original published format: JP 8201094
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971531
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971531
Date:25.10.2000
[2000/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971531
Date:27.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/32, H04N1/00
[2000/43]
Former International [2000/02]H04N1/32
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/29]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Netzwerksystem an welchem mehrere Bildverarbeitungsgeräte angeschlossen sind[2000/02]
English:Network system in which a plurality of image processing apparatuses are connected[2000/02]
French:Système de réseau auquel plusieurs appareils de traitement d'image sont connectés[2000/02]
Examination procedure12.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/19]
05.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.01.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
27.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.03.2006
21.02.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
14.03.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
29.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.08.2006Fee for grant paid
08.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95302527.7  / EP0679014
Opposition(s)28.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42]
Request for further processing for:27.03.2002Request for further processing filed
27.03.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.04.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
20.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
23.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
24.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
19.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 11
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[A]US4791492  (NAGASHIMA NAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 10, line 45 - column 12, line 47; figures 7,8 *;
 [A]US4652933  (KOSHIISHI TAKAHO [JP]) [A] 2,4,6,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0552960  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 2,4,6,8 * column 9, line 4 - line 15; figure 6 * * column 13, line 15 - column 14, line 10 *;
 [A]US5123063  (OHKUBO KENJI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 31 - line 65; figure 2 *