Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993772

EP0993772 - An implement for feeding young animals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAASLAND N.V.
Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / van der Lely, Olaf
11 Weinbergstrasse
6300 Zug / CH
02 / van der Lely, Alexander
44 Jan Witkampstraat
3065 NA Rotterdam / NL
03 / van den Berg, Karel
5 Boterbloemstraat
2971 BR Bleskensgraaf / NL
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Corten, Maurice Jean F.M. , et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V.
Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1
3147 PB Maassluis / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Corten, Maurice Jean F.M. , et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
Application number, filing date99203226.804.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateNL1998101030413.10.1998         Original published format: NL 1010304
[2000/16]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993772
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993772
Date:27.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01K15/02, A01K9/00
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:Fütterungsvorrichtung für junge Tiere[2000/16]
English:An implement for feeding young animals[2000/16]
French:Dispositif d'alimentation pour des animaux jeunes[2000/16]
Examination procedure01.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
10.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2001Fee for grant paid
26.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE27.03.2002
FI27.03.2002
GR27.03.2002
PT27.06.2002
LU04.10.2002
CY31.10.2002
[2004/39]
Former [2004/10]BE27.03.2002
FI27.03.2002
GR27.03.2002
PT27.06.2002
CY31.10.2002
Former [2003/21]BE27.03.2002
FI27.03.2002
GR27.03.2002
PT27.06.2002
Former [2003/19]BE27.03.2002
FI27.03.2002
GR27.03.2002
Former [2003/06]BE27.03.2002
FI27.03.2002
Former [2002/49]FI27.03.2002
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9619917  (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH], et al) [X] 1-5,7,11 * page 1 - page 7, line 6; figure 1 * [A] 13;
 [X]EP0064597  (FORSTER MARTIN DIPL ING) [X] 1-5 * page 6, lines 1-4 *;
 [A]SU1701206  (SIB N PROIZV OB KOLOS [SU]) [A] 1,13 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0189954  (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL])
by applicantEP0848588