Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994382

EP0994382 - Imaging element containing an electrically-conductive layer and a transparent magnetic recording layer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  22.10.2004
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Eichorst, Dennis John
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Majumdar, Debasis
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
03 / Falkner, Catherine Ann
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
04 / Yacobucci, Paul Daniel
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak
Boite n 2
Zone d'activité SAONEOR
12 rue Alfred Kastler
71530 Fragnes / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/37]Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle
71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR
Former [2000/16]Parent, Yves , et al
KODAK INDUSTRIE Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle - B.P. 21
71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date99203232.604.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateUS1998017290115.10.1998         Original published format: US 172901
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994382
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:G03C1/76, G03C11/02, G03C1/85, G03C5/14
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/01]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bildaufzeichnungselement mit einer elektrisch leitenden Schicht und einer durchsichtigen, magnetischen Aufzeichnungsschicht[2000/16]
English:Imaging element containing an electrically-conductive layer and a transparent magnetic recording layer[2000/16]
French:Elément formateur d'image ayant une couche électroconductrice et une couche d'enregistrement magnétique, transparente[2000/16]
Examination procedure21.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
18.10.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[DX]EP0511764  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [DX] 1,11 * page 8, line 1 - line 25 * * page 2, line 43 - line 45 * * page 3, line 8 - line 25 * * page 5, line 15 - line 32 * * page 21, line 6 - line 12 *;
 [A]US5215874  (SAKAKIBARA YOSHIO [JP]) [A] 1-11 * column 4, line 19 - line 32; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]  "PHOTOGRAPHIC LIGHT-SENSITIVE SILVER HALIDE FILM CAN COMPRISE A TRANSPARENT MAGNETIC RECORDING LAYER, USUALLY PROVIDED ON THE BACKSIDE OF THE PHOTOGRAPHIC SUPPORT", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE,GB,INDUSTRIAL OPPORTUNITIES LTD. HAVANT, (19921101), vol. 343, ISSN 0374-4353, pages 869 - 874COMPL, XP000324100 [A] 1-11 * page 869, paragraph 3 - paragraph 5 * * page 871, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 *