Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969020

EP0969020 - Mettallocene complexes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.03.2003
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.05.2003  [2003/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BP Chemicals Limited
Britannic House, 1 Finsbury Circus
London EC2M 7BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
BP Chemicals Limited
Britannic House, 1 Finsbury Circus
London EC2M 7BA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Chabrand, Christine Jacqueline, BP Chemicals SNC
BP No. 6
13117 Lavera / FR
02 / Little, Ian Raymond, BP Chemicals SNC
Chertsey Road, Sunbury-on-Thames
Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB
03 / McNally, John Paul, BP Chemicals SNC
BP No.6
13117 Lavera / FR
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Hawkins, David George , et al
BP International Limited
Group Patents & Agreements
Chertsy Road
Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex
TW16 7LN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Hawkins, David George , et al
BP International Limited Group Patents & Agreements Chertsey Road
Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB
Application number, filing date99203278.923.08.1993
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateGB1992001880504.09.1992         Original published format: GB 9218805
GB1993000596323.03.1993         Original published format: GB 9305963
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969020
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969020
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08F4/64, C08F4/02, C08F10/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:Metallocenkomplexe[2000/01]
English:Mettallocene complexes[2000/01]
French:Complexes métallocènes[2000/01]
Examination procedure08.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/18]
07.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/19]
28.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/19]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93306665.6  / EP0586167
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
07.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
07.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
02.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
17.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
10.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]WO8702991  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC) [X] 1 * page 5, line 31 - page 6, line 17 * * page 8, line 35; claim - *;
 [X]EP0372414  (HOECHST AG) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0496193  (HOECHST AG) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - ERKER, G. ET AL., "Hydroboration of Bis (alkenylcyclopentadienyl) zirconium Dichlorides", CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, Weinheim, vol. 124, no. 5, XP002122759 [X] 1 * page 1301 - page 1310 *
 [X]  - LI, S. ET AL, "Analysis of organometallic compounds. IX. Paper Chromatography of bis (alkenylcyclopentadienyl)titanium, -zirconium, and -hafnium dichlorides, dithiocyanato and dimercapto derivatives", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19871214), vol. 107, no. 24, Database accession no. 228099, XP002122750 [X] 1 * abstract *
    [ ] - SEPU, (1987), vol. 5, no. 2 [ ] * page 77 - page 80 *
 [X]  - CHEN, S. ET AL, "Study on bis (alkenylcyclopentadienyl) metal derivatives", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19830801), vol. 99, no. 5, Database accession no. 38581, XP002122751 [X] 1 * abstract *
    [ ] - KEXUE TONGBAO, (1983), vol. 23, no. 3 [ ] * page 127 *