Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996258

EP0996258 - Local area network with a terminal bridge for data transmission between a plurality of subnetworks and for loop detection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.02.2008
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Change - applicantpublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/47]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2003/20]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2002/40]For:DE 
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2000/17]For:DE 
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH
Habsburgerallee 11
52064 Aachen / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Du, Yonggang, Philips Corporate Int. Prop. GmbH
Habsburgerallee 11
52064 Aachen / DE
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Volmer, Georg
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Postfach 50 04 42
52088 Aachen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Volmer, Georg
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42
52088 Aachen / DE
Former [2000/17]Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing.
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property, Habsburgerallee 11-13
52064 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date99203354.812.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateDE199814834221.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19848342
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0996258
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0996258
Date:02.06.2004
[2004/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/46
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/08]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Lokales Netzwerk mit einem Brücken-Terminal zur Übertragung von Daten zwischen mehreren Sub-Netzwerken und zur Schleifendetektion[2000/17]
English:Local area network with a terminal bridge for data transmission between a plurality of subnetworks and for loop detection[2000/17]
French:Réseau local avec un terminal-pont pour la transmission de données entre plusieurs sous-réseaux et pour la détection des boucles[2000/17]
Examination procedure02.12.2004Examination requested  [2005/05]
24.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2007Date of oral proceedings
02.04.2007Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/12]
05.11.2007Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/12]
05.11.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200406   M06   Not yet paid
31.10.200709   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US4706081  (HART JOHN H [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6 * column 1, line 51 - line 63; figure 2 * * column 4, line 54 - line 62 * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 2 * * column 7, line 3 - line 8 * * column 7, line 27 - line 30 * * column 13, line 1 - line 14 * * column 13, line 27 - line 38 * [A] 2 [Y] 5;
 [Y]US5323394  (PERLMAN RADIA J [US]) [Y] 5 * column 22, line 12 - line 20 *