EP1092507 - Grinding disc manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carbodiam S.A. Rue Général Mellier 27 1495 Tilly / BE | [2002/49] |
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states S.A. Carbodiam Rue Général Mellier 27 1495 Tilly / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chevalier, Jean-Pierre Rue Général Mellier, 27 1495 Tilly / BE | 02 /
Boland, François Rue Général Mellier, 27 1495 Tilly / BE | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Vandeberg, Marie-Paule L.G., et al Office Kirkpatrick 32, avenue Wolfers 1310 La Hulpe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Vandeberg, Marie-Paule L.G., et al Office Kirkpatrick 32, avenue Wolfers 1310 La Hulpe / BE | ||
Former [2001/16] | Vandeberg, Marie-Paule L.G., et al Office Kirkpatrick S.A., 32, Avenue Wolfers 1310 La Hulpe / BE | Application number, filing date | 99203356.3 | 14.10.1999 | [2001/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1092507 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1092507 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B24D7/06, B23K26/00, B23K31/02 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
B24D7/066 (EP);
B23K26/244 (EP);
B23K26/32 (EP);
B23K2103/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/16] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren einer Schleifscheibe | [2001/16] | English: | Grinding disc manufacturing method | [2001/16] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un disque abrasif de meulage | [2001/16] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 28.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.01.2003 | FI | 02.01.2003 | GR | 02.01.2003 | IE | 02.01.2003 | IT | 02.01.2003 | DK | 02.04.2003 | PT | 02.04.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2004/02] | AT | 02.01.2003 | |
FI | 02.01.2003 | ||
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
IE | 02.01.2003 | ||
DK | 02.04.2003 | ||
PT | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 02.01.2003 | |
FI | 02.01.2003 | ||
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
PT | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 02.01.2003 | |
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
PT | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 02.01.2003 | |
PT | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 02.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61169183 ; | [A]US4689919 (KAWAKITA TAKAO [JP], et al) [A] 1,5 * abstract *; | [A]US5868125 (MAOUJOUD MOHAMMED [LU]) [A] 1,5 * column 10, line 62 - column 11, line 16 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861217), vol. 010, no. 378, Database accession no. (M - 546), & JP61169183 A 19860730 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1,5 * abstract * |