EP0998034 - Analog amplifier clipping circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way, Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muza, John M. 1500 Preston Road, No. 2212 Plano, Texas 75093 / US | [2000/18] | Representative(s) | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patent Department 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [2000/18] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited, European Patents Department (MS 13), PO Box 5069 Northampton NN4 7ZE / GB | Application number, filing date | 99203532.9 | 27.10.1999 | [2000/18] | Priority number, date | US19980106502 | 30.10.1998 Original published format: US 106502 | [2000/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0998034 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0998034 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0998034 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03G11/00 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
H03G11/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/18] | Title | German: | Begrenzungsschaltung für einen analogen Verstärker | [2000/18] | English: | Analog amplifier clipping circuit | [2000/18] | French: | Circuit d'écrêtage pour amplificateur analogique | [2000/18] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/40] | 18.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.06.2004 | BE | 30.06.2004 | CH | 30.06.2004 | CY | 30.06.2004 | FI | 30.06.2004 | IT | 30.06.2004 | LI | 30.06.2004 | NL | 30.06.2004 | DK | 30.09.2004 | GR | 30.09.2004 | SE | 30.09.2004 | ES | 11.10.2004 | IE | 27.10.2004 | LU | 27.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | PT | 30.11.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/21] | AT | 30.06.2004 | |
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
CY | 30.06.2004 | ||
FI | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
NL | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.09.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
ES | 11.10.2004 | ||
IE | 27.10.2004 | ||
LU | 27.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 30.06.2004 | |
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
FI | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
NL | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.09.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
ES | 11.10.2004 | ||
IE | 27.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 30.06.2004 | |
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
FI | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.09.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
ES | 11.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 30.06.2004 | |
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
FI | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.09.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
ES | 11.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 30.06.2004 | |
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
FI | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.09.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 30.06.2004 | |
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
FI | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 30.06.2004 | |
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
FI | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 30.06.2004 | |
FI | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 30.06.2004 | |
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 30.06.2004 | |
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 30.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2436638 (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US3999084 (BEAUDETTE RICHARD A) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP0352906 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 10 * abstract *; | [Y]US5412346 (BURGER JR HARLEY F [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,9,10 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0836914 (WUERTH ADOLF GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-3,9,10 * abstract * | Examination | EP0838914 |