Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1098094

EP1098094 - Flangelike toothed security plate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.05.2008
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Techspace Aero
121 Route de Liers
4041 Milmort - Herstal / BE
[2007/29]
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
Techspace aero
121 Route de Liers
4041 Milmort - Herstal / BE
Inventor(s)01 / LeClercq, Stéphane Maurice Edgard
Rue Saivelette 58
4671 Housse / BE
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)Nguyen, Dominique
Snecma
Département Propriété Intellectuelle - WRS/DJIB
77550 Moissy Cramayel / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Nguyen, Dominique
Snecma Département Propriété Intellectuelle - WRS/DJIB
77550 Moissy Cramayel / FR
Former [2004/46]Nguyen, Dominique
Snecma Moteurs Département Propriété Industrielle W/DJB Site de Villaroche
77550 Moissy Cramayel / FR
Former [2001/19]Berrou, Paul
Snecma Moteurs Propriété Intellectuelle, B.P. 81
91003 Evry Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date99203609.502.11.1999
[2001/19]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1098094
Date:09.05.2001
Language:FR
[2001/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1098094
Date:18.07.2007
Language:FR
[2007/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16B39/10
[2001/19]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB [2002/05]
Former [2001/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Flanschartige gezahnte Sicherheitsplatte[2001/19]
English:Flangelike toothed security plate[2001/19]
French:Plaque de securité crantée et bridée[2001/19]
Examination procedure20.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/33]
08.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2006Fee for grant paid
20.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)21.04.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26]
Request for further processing for:24.08.2006Request for further processing filed
05.10.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.06.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
28.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]US5094117  (MIKEL STEVEN A [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,3,5 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]US3077913  (WILLIAM BRYSON) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]FR981033  (LAZZARONI) [A] 1 * figures 2,4 *