Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1005245

EP1005245 - Handover between cell sectors in a cellular radio communications system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.06.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2003/41]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor
Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION
World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8TH FLOOR
Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Bevan, David Damian Nicholas
79 Thornbera Road
Bishops Stortford, Herts CM23 3NN / GB
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Hermele, Daniel Stephen , et al
Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road
Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB
[2006/09]
Former [2003/16]Anderson, Angela , et al
Nortel Networks IP Law Group, Harlow Laboratories, London Road
Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB
Former [2000/37]Bewley, Ewan Stuart , et al
Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road
Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB
Former [2000/22]Humphrey-Evans, Edward John , et al
Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road
Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB
Application number, filing date99203627.703.11.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateUS1998019838724.11.1998         Original published format: US 198387
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1005245
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1005245
Date:25.10.2000
[2000/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/29]
Former [2000/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Weiterreichen zwischen Sektoren in einem zellularen Funkkommunikationssystem[2000/22]
English:Handover between cell sectors in a cellular radio communications system[2000/22]
French:Transfert de secteur cellulaire pour un système de radiocommunication cellulaire[2000/22]
Examination procedure25.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/26]
18.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/29]
26.02.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2008/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
07.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200709   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9811748  (AIRNET COMMUNICATIONS CORP [US]) [X] 1,5-7,12-15,19 * page 14, lines 1-17 * * figure 6 *;
 [X]US5067147  (LEE WILLIAM C [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,12-17 * column 5, lines 5-13 * * column 8, line 32 - column 9, line 23 *;
 [A]WO9512296  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-8,12-17 * page 11, line 32 - page 12, line 30 *