blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1010742

EP1010742 - Green organic electroluminescent devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2000/25]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chen, Chin Hsin, c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Tang, Chin Wan, c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
03 / Shi, Jianmin, c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
04 / Klubek, Kevin P., C/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al
Kodak
Boite n 2
Zone d'activité SAONEOR
12 rue Alfred Kastler
71530 Fragnes / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/37]Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al
Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle
71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR
Former [2002/16]Parent, Yves, et al
KODAK INDUSTRIE, Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle
71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR
Former [2000/25]Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung
70323 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99204151.706.12.1999
[2000/25]
Priority number, dateUS1998021623818.12.1998         Original published format: US 216238
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1010742
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1010742
Date:31.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2000
ClassificationIPC:C09K11/06, H05B33/14, C09B57/02, H01L51/20
[2000/25]
CPC:
H10K50/11 (EP,US); Y10S428/917 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/10]
Former [2000/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Grünorganische Elektrolumineszenzvorrichtungen[2000/25]
English:Green organic electroluminescent devices[2000/25]
French:Dispositifs organiques électroluminescents émettant dans le vert[2000/25]
Examination procedure25.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
03.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2004Fee for grant paid
16.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
03.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH069952  ;
 [A]JPH02191694  ;
 [A]US4544496  (CLAUSSEN UWE [DE], et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document *;
 [DA]US4769292  (TANG CHING W [US], et al) [DA] 1-6 * column 11, line 29 - column 12, line 48 *;
 [A]EP0797376  (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940418), vol. 018, no. 215, Database accession no. (C - 1191), & JP06009952 A 19940118 (TDK CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901015), vol. 014, no. 470, Database accession no. (C - 0769), & JP02191694 A 19900727 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.