Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1016912

EP1016912 - Photographic recording material for accelerated development [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.06.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.07.2004  [2004/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Friday, James A.
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Lunt, Sharon R.
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
03 / Sutton, Scott C.
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak
Boite n 2
Zone d'activité SAONEOR
12 rue Alfred Kastler
71530 Fragnes / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/37]Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle
71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR
Former [2000/27]Parent, Yves , et al
KODAK INDUSTRIE Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle B.P. 21
71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date99204272.113.12.1999
[2000/27]
Priority number, dateUS1998022423030.12.1998         Original published format: US 224230
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1016912
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1016912
Date:20.09.2000
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1016912
Date:06.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP03.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:G03C7/305
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2003/30]
Former [2001/23]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2000/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Photographisches Aufzeichnungsmaterial für beschleunigte Entwicklung[2000/27]
English:Photographic recording material for accelerated development[2000/27]
French:Matériau d'enregistrement photographique pour développement accéléré[2000/27]
Examination procedure22.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/16]
20.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.05.2003Fee for grant paid
26.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DA]US4859578  (MICHNO DRAKE M [US], et al) [DA] 1-10 * column 1, line 6 - line 17 * * column 2, line 26 - line 56 * * column 4, line 52 - line 65 * * column 10, line 66 - column 19, line 56 * * column 29, line 59 - column 33, line 12 * * claims 1,2,15,16 *;
 [DA]US5605786  (SAITO NAOKI [JP], et al) [DA] 1-10 * column 1, line 9 - line 15 * * column 2, line 17 - line 22 * * column 6, line 16 - line 56 * * column 21, coupler (23) * * column 35, line 54 - line 57 * * column 36, line 3 - line 8 * * claims 1,8,9,17 *;
 [A]EP0430003  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 3 - line 4 * * page 2, line 17 - line 19 * * page 8, line 39 - page 16, line 37 * * page 18, line 12 - line 14 * * examples * * claims 1,13,14 *