Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034905

EP1034905 - An apparatus for depositing layers of glaze and the like on ceramic supports [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.08.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SYFAL S.p.A.
Via Mazzini 5
41049 Sassuolo (Modena) / IT
[2003/38]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
Ronflette S.A.
No. 32, Rue A. Neyen
2233 Luxembourg / LU
Inventor(s)01 / Stefani, Franco
No. 1, Via P. Ferrari
41049 Sassuolo (MO) / IT
02 / Montagnani, Mauro
No. 15, Via Settembrini
41049 Sassuolo (MO) / IT
 [2003/40]
Former [2000/37]01 / Stefani, Franco
No. 1, Via P. Farrari
41049 Sassuolo (MO) / IT
02 / Montagnani, Mauro
No. 15, Via Settembrini
41049 Sassuolo (MO) / IT
Representative(s)Gotra, Stefano , et al
BUGNION S.p.A.
Via M. Vellani, 20
41124 Modena / IT
[N/P]
Former [2003/38]Gotra, Stefano , et al
BUGNION S.p.A. Via Emilia Est 25
41100 Modena / IT
Former [2000/37]Gotra, Stefano
BUGNION S.p.A. No. 25, Via Emilia Est
41100 Modena / IT
Application number, filing date99204364.617.12.1999
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateIT1999MO0003605.03.1999         Original published format: IT MO990036
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1034905
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1034905
Date:14.03.2001
[2001/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1034905
Date:08.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP30.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:B28B11/04, B05C1/08
[2001/11]
Former International [2000/37]B28B11/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Aufbringen von Schichten aus Glasur und dergleichen auf keramischen Gegenständen[2000/37]
English:An apparatus for depositing layers of glaze and the like on ceramic supports[2000/37]
French:Dispositif pour déposer des couches d'émail et de matériaux similaires sur des objets en céramique[2000/37]
Examination procedure23.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/27]
16.05.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
05.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2002Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
27.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.07.2003Fee for grant paid
17.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.10.2003
BE08.10.2003
CH08.10.2003
FI08.10.2003
LI08.10.2003
NL08.10.2003
CY17.12.2003
IE17.12.2003
LU17.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
DK08.01.2004
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
[2005/23]
Former [2005/03]AT08.10.2003
BE08.10.2003
CH08.10.2003
FI08.10.2003
LI08.10.2003
NL08.10.2003
CY17.12.2003
IE17.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
DK08.01.2004
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
Former [2005/02]AT08.10.2003
BE08.10.2003
CH08.10.2003
FI08.10.2003
LI08.10.2003
NL08.10.2003
CY17.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
DK08.01.2004
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
Former [2004/52]AT08.10.2003
BE08.10.2003
CH08.10.2003
FI08.10.2003
LI08.10.2003
NL08.10.2003
CY17.12.2003
DK08.01.2004
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
Former [2004/41]AT08.10.2003
CH08.10.2003
FI08.10.2003
LI08.10.2003
NL08.10.2003
CY17.12.2003
DK08.01.2004
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
Former [2004/36]AT08.10.2003
CH08.10.2003
FI08.10.2003
LI08.10.2003
NL08.10.2003
CY17.12.2003
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
Former [2004/33]AT08.10.2003
CH08.10.2003
FI08.10.2003
LI08.10.2003
NL08.10.2003
GR08.01.2004
SE08.01.2004
Former [2004/31]AT08.10.2003
FI08.10.2003
SE08.01.2004
Former [2004/26]FI08.10.2003
SE08.01.2004
Former [2004/24]SE08.01.2004
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0677364  (SYFAL SRL [IT]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US4301583  (POOLE JOHNNIE L) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0542190  (SENGEWALD KARL H GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 7, line 29 - line 56 * * figures 1,2E *;
 [A]EP0822043  (SYFAL SRL [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantIT1287465