Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1017152

EP1017152 - Rotor for high speed permanent magnet motor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.07.2011
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.08.2011  [2011/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Research Ltd.
Affolternstrasse 44, P.O. Box 8131
8050 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
ABB Research Ltd.
Affolternstrasse 44, P.O. Box 8131
8050 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Antoniazzi, Antonello
Via Arbe, 29
20125 Milano / IT
02 / Moriconi, Franco
Via Aldo Moro, 1/B
20097 San Donato Milanese (Mi) / IT
03 / Pacinotti, Marco
Via Giambologna, 17
20136 Milano / IT
04 / Secondo, Giulio
Via Salita Santa Maria della Sanità, 58
16122 Genova / IT
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Giavarini, Francesco , et al
Zanoli & Giavarini S.p.A.
Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64
20125 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Giavarini, Francesco , et al
Zanoli & Giavarini S.r.l. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64
20125 Milano / IT
Former [2006/34]Giavarini, Francesco , et al
Zanoli & Giavarini S.r.l. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64
20125 Milano / IT
Former [2003/20]Giavarini, Francesco , et al
ZANOLI & GIAVARINI S.r.l. Viale Bianca Maria, 35
20122 Milano / IT
Former [2002/35]Giavarini, Francesco , et al
GIAVARINI E ASSOCIATI S.R.L. Via XX Settembre, 58/A
24122 Bergamo / IT
Former [2000/27]Giavarini, Francesco
ABB Ricerca S.p.A. Viale Edison, 50
20099 Sesto San Giovanni (MI) / IT
Application number, filing date99204366.117.12.1999
[2000/27]
Priority number, dateIT1998MI0286130.12.1998         Original published format: IT MI982861
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1017152
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1017152
Date:20.12.2000
[2000/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02K1/27, H02K1/30
[2000/51]
Former International [2000/27]H02K1/27
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/36]
Former [2000/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Läufer für einen schnellaufenden Dauermagnetmotor[2000/27]
English:Rotor for high speed permanent magnet motor[2000/27]
French:Rotor pour moteur à aimants permanents à haute vitesse[2000/27]
Examination procedure05.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/31]
21.06.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.10.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
26.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.03.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/35]
05.04.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/35]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.09.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
07.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
13.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
16.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
23.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
26.07.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201012   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4906882  (ERNDT HANS [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [X]JPS6146154  ;
 [X]GB2181307  (JOHNSON ELECTRIC IND MFG) [X] 1,4,5,7 * figure 12 *;
 [X]US4882513  (FLYGARE WAYNE A [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 2 *;
 [X]US5650680  (CHULA STANLEY S [US]) [X] 1,2,5,9,16,17 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860717), vol. 010, no. 205, Database accession no. (E - 420), [X] 1,4,5,7 * abstract *