Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037130

EP1037130 - Flight control apparatus for helicopters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.06.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.07.2003  [2003/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Advanced Technology Institute of Commuter-Helicopter, Ltd.
2, Kawasaki-cho Kakamigahara-shi
Gifu / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Advanced Technology Institute of Commuter-Helicopter, Ltd.
2, Kawasaki-cho
Kakamigahara-shi, Gifu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tomio, Takeshi, Advanced Technology Institute of
Commuter-Helicopter, Ltd., 2, Kawasaki-cho
Kakamigahara-shi, Gifu / JP
02 / Shirasaya, Hideki, Advanced Technology Inst. of
Commuter-Helicopter, Ltd., 2, Kawasaki-cho
Kakamigahara-shi, Gifu / JP
03 / Tobari, Shigeru, Advanced Technology Institute of
Commuter-Helicopter, Ltd., 2, Kawasaki-cho
Kakamigahara-shi, Gifu / JP
04 / Sudo, Ikuo, Advanced Technology Institute of
Commuter-Helicopter, Ltd., 2, Kawasaki-cho
Kakamigahara-shi, Gifu / JP
05 / Kubo, Yoshihara, Advanced Technology Institute of
Commuter-Helicopter, Ltd., 2, Kawasaki-cho
Kakamigahara-shi, Gifu / JP
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2003/15]Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Former [2000/38]Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe , et al
Vereenigde, Postbus 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date99204380.217.12.1999
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateJP1999006752712.03.1999         Original published format: JP 6752799
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1037130
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1037130
Date:24.04.2002
[2002/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP13.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:G05D1/08, G05D1/00
[2002/17]
Former International [2000/38]G05D1/08
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/03]
Former [2000/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Flugsteuerungsvorrichtung für Hubschrauber[2000/38]
English:Flight control apparatus for helicopters[2000/38]
French:Dispositif de commande de vol pour hélicoptères[2000/38]
Examination procedure25.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/31]
27.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.12.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
09.12.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
09.12.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
09.12.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.12.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
09.12.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.12.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
09.12.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.12.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
09.12.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
09.12.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.12.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
09.12.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
09.12.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
09.12.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.12.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
09.12.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
09.12.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
09.12.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4198017  (MURRAY JAMES B [US]) [X] 1-4,1,3,4 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 10; figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 10; figure 1 * [Y] 2;
 [Y]US3236478  (ROY ADAMS F LE, et al) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 24 - column 2, line 58; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US4227664  (SKUTECKI EDMUND R) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 10 - column 4, line 48; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US5791596  (GAUTIER JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 66 - column 9, line 54; figures 2-4,6 *;
 [A]US5141177  (WRIGHT STUART C [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4758958  (VON GERSDORFF MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *