Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1016345

EP1016345 - Method and device for forming fish- or meatfillets under pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A.
Case postale 353
1800 Vevey / CH
[2006/11]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A.
Case postale 353
1800 Vevey / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Blauwart, Robert
31, Rue de la Vierge
76330 Tourville-La-Chapelle / FR
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Thomas, Alain , et al
55, avenue Nestlé
1800 Vevey / CH
[2005/21]
Former [2000/27]Borne, Patrice Daniel , et al
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Application number, filing date99204506.223.12.1999
[2000/27]
Priority number, dateFR1998001649728.12.1998         Original published format: FR 9816497
[2000/27]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1016345
Date:05.07.2000
Language:FR
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1016345
Date:15.03.2006
Language:FR
[2006/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:A22C25/00
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Formen von Fisch- oder Fleischfilets unter Druck[2000/27]
English:Method and device for forming fish- or meatfillets under pressure[2000/27]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour former des filets de viande ou de poisson sous pression[2000/27]
Examination procedure05.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/10]
26.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2006Fee for grant paid
09.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.03.2006
CY15.03.2006
FI15.03.2006
IE15.03.2006
DK15.06.2006
GR16.06.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/21]AT15.03.2006
FI15.03.2006
IE15.03.2006
DK15.06.2006
GR16.06.2006
Former [2008/17]AT15.03.2006
FI15.03.2006
IE15.03.2006
DK15.06.2006
Former [2007/21]AT15.03.2006
FI15.03.2006
IE15.03.2006
DK15.06.2006
Former [2006/43]AT15.03.2006
FI15.03.2006
Former [2006/36]FI15.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]US3924012  (MARSHALL ROBERT SWINBURN, et al) [X] 1,5,8,10 * column 4, line 19 - line 60; figure 1 *;
 [DA]FR2145730  (GORTON CORP) [DA] 2,4,8,11-14 * page 4, line 12 - page 8, line 20 *;
 [A]EP0647409  (NIENSTEDT HEINZ MASCHF [DE]);
 [A]BE749279  (UNILEVER NV)