Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1016987

EP1016987 - Propagating updates efficiently in hierarchically structured data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2008
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
4120 Network Circle, MS SCA 12-203
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/45]For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
4120 Network Circle, MS SCA 12-203 Santa Clara
California 95054 / US
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
901 San Antonio Road, MS PAL1-521
Palo Alto, California 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Thulasiraman, Jeyaraman
3586 Payne Ave. No.10
San Jose, CA 95117 / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Hanna, Peter William Derek , et al
Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Hanna, Peter William Derek , et al
Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane
Dublin 2 / IE
Former [2003/33]Hanna, Peter William Derek , et al
Hanna, Moore & Curley, 11 Mespil Road
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2001/12]Hanna, Peter William Derek
Peter Hanna Associates 11 Mespil Road
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2000/35]Hanna, Peter William Derek , et al
Tomkins & Co., 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Former [2000/27]Shortt, Peter Bernard , et al
TOMKINS & CO., 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date99204514.623.12.1999
[2000/27]
Priority number, dateUS1998022208829.12.1998         Original published format: US 222088
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1016987
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1016987
Date:14.03.2001
[2001/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:Ausbreitung von Aktualisierungen in hierarchischen strukturierten Daten[2000/27]
English:Propagating updates efficiently in hierarchically structured data[2000/27]
French:Propagation de mises à jour dans des données à structure hierarchique[2000/27]
Examination procedure08.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/05]
11.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/52]
06.08.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200709   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]  BANGA G ET AL, "Optimistic deltas for WWW latency reduction", PROCEEDINGS OF THE USENIX 1997 ANNUAL TECHNICAL CONFERENCE, PROCEEDINGS OF USENIX 1997 ANNUAL TECHNICAL CONFERENCE, ANAHEIM, CA, USA, 6-10 JAN. 1997, 1997, Berkeley, CA, USA, USENIX Assoc, USA, ISBN 1-880446-84-7, pages 289 - 303, XP000874445 [Y] 1-3,5-8,10,11,14-22,24-26 * page 296, column L, line 6 - line 51; figure 6; table 1 *
 [Y]  CHANG G J S ET AL, "A graphical environment for change detection in structured documents", PROCEEDINGS TWENTY-FIRST ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL COMPUTER SOFTWARE AND APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE (COMPSAC'97) (CAT. NO.97CB36112), PROCEEDINGS TWENTY-FIRST ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL COMPUTER SOFTWARE AND APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE (COMPSAC'97), WASHINGTON, DC, US, 1997, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc, USA, ISBN 0-8186-8105-5, pages 536 - 541, XP002157517 [Y] 1-3,5-8,10,11,14-22,24-26 * page 536, column R, line 31 - page 537, column L, line 31 * * page 537, column R, line 31 - page 539, column L, line 20; figures 1-4 *
 [A]  HOUSEL C ET AL, "WebExpress: a System for Optimizing Web Browsing in a Wireless Environment", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SECOND ANNUAL CONFERENCE ON MOBILE COMPUTING AND NETWORKING, WHITE PLAINS, NY, USA, (19961111), pages 108 - 116, XP002157547 [A] 1,3,6,8,11,14-19,22,24,25 * page 110, column L, line 1 - column R, line 23; figure 2 * * page 112, column L, line 1 - page 113, column L, line 8; figures 4-6 *
 [A]  WILLIAMS S, HTTP: Delta-Encoding Notes, XP002157520 [A] 1,4,6,9,11,18,19,23-25 * section 4.c. *
 [A]  CHAWATHE S S ET AL, "Meaningful change detection in structured data", SIGMOD 1997. ACM SIGMOD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MANAGEMENT OF DATA, TUCSON, AZ, USA, 13-15 MAY 1997, SIGMOD Record, June 1997, ACM, USA, vol. 26, no. 2, ISSN 0163-5808, pages 26 - 37, XP002157519 [A] 1,2,6,7,10,11,18-21,24-26 * page 26, column L, line 1 - page 27, column L, line 9 * * page 27, column R, line 4 - page 28, column L, line 21; figure 1 *