Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1017177

EP1017177 - Configurable Reed-Solomon encoder/decoder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.03.2005
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
7839 Churchill Way
Mail Station 3999
Dallas, Texas 75251 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
7839 Churchill Way, Mail Station 3999
Dallas, Texas 75251 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wolf, Tod D
2107 Oak Brook Drive
Richardson, Texas 75081 / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Holt, Michael
Texas Instruments Limited
European Patent Department
3rd Floor
401 Grafton Gate
Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Holt, Michael
Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive
Northampton NN4 7YL / GB
Former [2000/27]Holt, Michael
Texas Instruments Limited, European Patents Department (MS 13), PO Box 5069
Northampton NN4 7ZE / GB
Application number, filing date99204580.723.12.1999
[2000/27]
Priority number, dateUS19980114186P30.12.1998         Original published format: US 114186 P
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1017177
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1017177
Date:06.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H03M13/15
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:Konfigurierbarer Reed-Solomon Kodierer/Dekodierer[2000/27]
English:Configurable Reed-Solomon encoder/decoder[2000/27]
French:Encodeur-décodeur configurable pour code Reed-Solomon[2000/27]
Examination procedure05.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/10]
23.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.2003Fee for grant paid
20.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)08.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/17]
Request for further processing for:30.04.2003Request for further processing filed
02.05.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.05.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.05.2004
BE06.05.2004
CH06.05.2004
CY06.05.2004
ES06.05.2004
FI06.05.2004
IT06.05.2004
LI06.05.2004
NL06.05.2004
DK06.08.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
PT06.10.2004
IE23.12.2004
LU23.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]AT06.05.2004
BE06.05.2004
CH06.05.2004
CY06.05.2004
ES06.05.2004
FI06.05.2004
LI06.05.2004
NL06.05.2004
DK06.08.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
IE23.12.2004
LU23.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2006/13]AT06.05.2004
BE06.05.2004
CH06.05.2004
FI06.05.2004
LI06.05.2004
NL06.05.2004
DK06.08.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
IE23.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2005/45]AT06.05.2004
BE06.05.2004
CH06.05.2004
FI06.05.2004
LI06.05.2004
DK06.08.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2005/18]AT06.05.2004
BE06.05.2004
CH06.05.2004
FI06.05.2004
LI06.05.2004
DK06.08.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
Former [2005/14]AT06.05.2004
BE06.05.2004
CH06.05.2004
FI06.05.2004
LI06.05.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
Former [2005/11]AT06.05.2004
CH06.05.2004
FI06.05.2004
LI06.05.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
Former [2005/06]CH06.05.2004
FI06.05.2004
LI06.05.2004
GR06.08.2004
SE06.08.2004
Former [2005/02]CH06.05.2004
FI06.05.2004
LI06.05.2004
SE06.08.2004
Former [2004/52]CH06.05.2004
LI06.05.2004
SE06.08.2004
Former [2004/51]CH06.05.2004
LI06.05.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]US5323402  (VACCARO JOHN J [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 4, paragraph L * * column 6, line 40 - line 45 * * column 7, line 33 - line 36 * * column 15, line 59 - line 62 * * column 16, line 42 - line 63 * * column 17, line 34 - line 39 *;
 [A]JPS61237521  ;
 [PX]WO9945911  (TIERNAN COMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) [PX] 1-8 * column W *
 [X]  - HAHN M, "CHANNEL CODEC PERFORMS VERSATILE ERROR-CORRECTION", IEE PROCEEDINGS E. COMPUTERS & DIGITAL TECHNIQUES,GB,INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS. STEVENAGE, (19900501), vol. 137, no. 3, PART E, ISSN 1350-2387, pages 197 - 201, XP000114508 [X] 1-8 * page 198, column R, paragraph L - column L, line 20; figure 2 * * abstract *
 [X]  - JOHNSON B L, "DESIGN AND HARDWARE IMPLEMENTATION OF A VERSATILE TRANSFORM DECODER FOR REED-SOLOMON CODES", PROCEEDINGS NATO ADVANCED STUDY INSTITUTE, BANFF/CAN,XX,XX, (19830711), no. 91, pages 447 - 464, XP000613471 [X] 1-8 * abstract * * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870313), vol. 011, no. 083, Database accession no. (E - 489), [A] 1-16 * abstract *