Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969579

EP0969579 - Electronic overcurrent tripping relay and method of operating same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.03.2004  [2004/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Baumgaertl, Ulrich
Ringsbergstr. 51
13599 Berlin / DE
02 / Hochgraef, Holger
Dorfstr. 18
18845 Wusterhausen / DE
03 / Röhl, Wolfgang
Im Rehgrund 43 A
13503 Berlin / DE
[2000/01]
Application number, filing date99250189.015.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateDE199813006530.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19830065
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969579
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969579
Date:18.12.2002
[2002/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:H02H3/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting states[2003/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektronischer Überstromauslöser und Verfahren zu seinem Betrieb[2000/01]
English:Electronic overcurrent tripping relay and method of operating same[2000/01]
French:Relais de déclenchement électronique de sur-courant et procédé pour sa mise en oeuvre[2000/01]
Examination procedure19.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/13]
17.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
30.07.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
30.07.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5648887  (HERNDON RICHARD S [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column A *