Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971469

EP0971469 - Electronic overcurrent tripping relay with an analog bypass circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.05.2005
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.07.2005  [2005/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Röhl, Wolfgang
Im Rehgrund 43A
13503 Berlin / DE
02 / Baumgartl, Ulrich
Riensbergstrasse 51
13599 Berlin / DE
03 / Hochgraef, Holger
Dorfstrasse 18
16845 Ganzer / DE
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date99250208.825.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateDE199813259909.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19832599
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971469
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971469
Date:18.12.2002
[2002/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:H02H3/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/37]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektronischer Überstromauslöser mit einer analogen Umgehungsschaltung[2000/02]
English:Electronic overcurrent tripping relay with an analog bypass circuit[2000/02]
French:Relais de déclenchement électronique de sur-courant avec un circuit de dérivation analogue[2000/02]
Examination procedure02.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/32]
01.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/27]
08.02.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0279689  (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [DA]DE4445060  (SIEMENS AG) [DA] 1 * abstract *