Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0974801 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0974801



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 88
17.10.2003 Closing of application Search / examination 1
04.08.2003 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
07.07.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 1
23.01.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
23.01.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
23.01.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
02.11.2000 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
22.08.2000 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
08.05.2000 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
02.02.2000 Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant Search / examination 1
15.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
09.12.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
02.12.1999 Request for assignment Search / examination 2
19.11.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
10.11.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
10.11.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.11.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
28.06.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.06.1999 Claims Search / examination 4
28.06.1999 Description Search / examination 9
28.06.1999 Description Search / examination 1
28.06.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.06.1999 Drawings Search / examination 7
28.06.1999 Priority document Search / examination 16
28.06.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6