Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0974801


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.10.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  10.12.2003  [2003/50]
31.07.2003 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
03.07.2003 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
18.01.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.06.2002 Renewal fee
29.05.2001 Renewal fee
07.02.2001 Loss of particular rights
31.10.2000 Loss of particular rights
16.10.2000 Change - extension states
18.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  04.10.2000 [2000/40]
17.08.2000 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
28.01.2000 Change - applicant published on  15.03.2000 [2000/11]
23.12.1999 Request for examination filed published on  09.02.2000 [2000/06]
11.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]