Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974801

EP0974801 - Method and apparatus for slag-free tapping [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.12.2003  [2003/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMS Demag AG
Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[2000/11]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft
Mannesmannufer 2
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Fuchs, Reinhard
Kurze Strasse 10
41849 Wassenberg / DE
02 / Thomsen, Flemming
Lynaestoften 3
3390 Hundested / DK
03 / Jensen, Jan Tybjerg
Heilmannsvej 2
3300 Frederiksvaerk / DK
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Meissner, Peter E. , et al
Meissner & Meissner
Patentanwaltsbüro
Hohenzollerndamm 89
14199 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Hohenzollerndamm 89
14199 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date99250213.828.06.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateDE199813508724.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19835087
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974801
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:F27D3/15
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/40]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Einrichtung zum schlackefreien Abstechen[2000/04]
English:Method and apparatus for slag-free tapping[2000/04]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour laisser couler exempt de scories[2000/04]
Examination procedure02.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
27.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, IE, MC
23.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/50]
07.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE19543058  (MANNESMANN AG) [DA] 1,8 * claims 1,6 *;
 [DA]DE3437810  (KORTEC AG) [DA] 8-12 * claims 1-12 *;
 [A]US4520861  (SOBOLEWSKI ROBERT ET AL) [A] 1,8 * claims 1-6 *;
 [A]JPS6372475  ;
 [PA]FR2765316  (VESUVIUS FRANCE SA) [PA] 1-17 * figures 1,3,7; claims 1,5,6,9,12,18,21,23-29 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880811), vol. 012, no. 294, Database accession no. (M - 730), & JP63072475 A 19880402 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [A] 15 * abstract *