Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968798

EP0968798 - Motor driven stapler [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.09.2006  [2006/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAX CO., LTD.
6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/39]For all designated states
MAX CO., LTD.
6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
MAX CO., LTD.
6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho
Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshie, Toru
c/o Max Co., Ltd., 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho
Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner
Mozartstrasse 17
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99250221.102.07.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998018930003.07.1998         Original published format: JP 18930098
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0968798
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0968798
Date:19.03.2003
[2003/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968798
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP04.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:B27F7/19, B27F7/38
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [2003/50]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Motorisch angetriebenes Klammergerät[2000/01]
English:Motor driven stapler[2000/01]
French:Agrafeuse entraînée par moteur[2000/01]
Examination procedure25.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/39]
04.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.05.2005Fee for grant paid
03.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
28.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0322906  (MAX CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figures 6-10; claims 4,17-20 * [A] 3;
 [A]US2845626  (LANG JOSEPH C) [A] 1-3 * column 6, lines 35-66; figures 12,13 *;
 [A]US2469054  (WERNER SCHAFROTH) [A] 1,2 * column 4, lines 25-40; figure 5 *