Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974704

EP0974704 - Method to replace parts of sewer channels that comprise in-built elements [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.11.2002
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.09.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 20.10.2004  [2004/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Berliner Wasserbetriebe Anstalt des öffentlichen Rechts
Neue Jüdenstrasse 1
10179 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/03]For all designated states
Berliner Wasserbetriebe Anstalt des öffentlichen Rechts
Neue Jüdenstrasse 1
10179 Berlin / DE
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Berliner Wasserbetriebe Anstalt des öffentlichen Rechts
Neue Jüdenstrasse 1
10178 Berlin-Mitte / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gaebelein, Wilhelm, Dr.-ing.
Niklasstrasse 53
14163 Berlin / DE
02 / Röling, Michael, Dipl.-Ing.
Peter-Vischer-Strasse 9
12157 Berlin / DE
[2000/04]
Application number, filing date99250241.919.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateDE199813503423.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19835034
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974704
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974704
Date:23.01.2002
Language:DE
[2002/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:E03F3/04
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Auswechselung von mit Einbauteilen versehenen Entwässerungskanälen[2000/04]
English:Method to replace parts of sewer channels that comprise in-built elements[2000/04]
French:Méthode pour le remplacement partiel de canalisations comprenant des éléments incorporés[2000/04]
Examination procedure12.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
25.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.11.2001Fee for grant paid
19.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)24.10.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI23.01.2002
GR23.01.2002
IE23.01.2002
LU19.07.2002
CY31.07.2002
[2004/43]
Former [2004/39]FI23.01.2002
GR23.01.2002
LU19.07.2002
CY31.07.2002
Former [2004/10]FI23.01.2002
GR23.01.2002
CY31.07.2002
Former [2003/19]FI23.01.2002
GR23.01.2002
Former [2002/49]FI23.01.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH102481  ;
 [A]US1765999  (HOWARD PARKER) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2346500  (DERUDDER ROGER [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 7 *;
 [A]GB2124728  (MICRO CONSULTANTS LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantDE4203719