Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992947

EP0992947 - Apparatus and method for the storing of data concerning the usage of an end-user device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2007
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2007  [2007/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Francotyp-Postalia GmbH
Triftweg 21-26
16547 Birkenwerder / DE
[2006/01]
Former [2002/28]For all designated states
Francotyp-Postalia AG & Co. KG
Triftweg 21-26
16547 Birkenwerder / DE
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Francotyp-Postalia Aktiengesellschaft & Co.
Triftweg 21-26
16547 Birkenwerder / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Müller, Matthias
Strelitzer Strasse 17
10115 Berlin / DE
02 / Reisinger, Frank
Eisenacher Strasse 47
16515 Oranienburg / DE
03 / Turner, Olaf
Leonberger Ring 33
12349 Berlin / DE
[2000/15]
Application number, filing date99250331.820.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateDE199814795109.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19847951
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992947
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992947
Date:13.12.2000
[2000/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992947
Date:07.06.2006
Language:DE
[2006/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:G07B17/00
[2000/50]
Former International [2000/15]G07B17/02
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2001/36]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Anordnung und Verfahren zur Speicherung von Daten über eine Benutzung eines Endgerätes[2000/15]
English:Apparatus and method for the storing of data concerning the usage of an end-user device[2000/15]
French:Dispositif et procédé de stockage de données d'utilisation d'un appareil par un utilisateur[2000/15]
Examination procedure12.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/24]
08.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2006Fee for grant paid
22.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
01.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
05.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US4442501  (ECKERT JR ALTON B [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 3; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4931943  (VERMESSE BERNARD [FR]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0516403  (NEOPOST LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5309363  (GRAVES FRANK M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5805711  (WINDEL HARALD [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4812965  (TAYLOR MICHAEL P [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5710706  (MAERKL KATRIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 4; claim 1 *
by applicantEP0747864
 DE19549305
 DE19517557
 EP0493948
 EP0285956
 DE4224955
 FR2665003
 EP0717376