Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994545

EP0994545 - Circuit for controlling a tripping device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.09.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.11.2005  [2005/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bürger, Jens
Castorring 42
16321 Bernau / DE
02 / Schuckar, Detlev
Afred-Rojek-Weg 11
12355 Berlin / DE
[2000/16]
Application number, filing date99250360.712.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateDE199814929616.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19849296
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994545
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994545
Date:11.04.2001
[2001/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:H02H1/06
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   LI [2002/01]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schaltungsanordnung zur Ansteuerung eines Auslösers[2000/16]
English:Circuit for controlling a tripping device[2000/16]
French:Circuit de commande d'un déclencheur[2000/16]
Examination procedure20.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/33]
03.05.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/45]
07.06.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0399283  (BTICINO SRL [IT]) [Y] 1-3 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 14; figure 2 *;
 [Y]WO9103826  (SQUARE D CO [US]) [Y] 1-3 * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 11; figure 3A *