Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1004418

EP1004418 - Interior liner for motor vehicles and method for making same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.12.2004
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Faurecia Innenraum Systeme GmbH
Faureciastrasse 1
76767 Hagenbach / DE
For:AT  BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  FI  FR  GR  IE  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE 
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
Berliner Ring 2
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
[2004/25]
Former [2004/23]For all designated states
Faurecia Innenraum Systeme GmbH
Faureciastrasse 1
76767 Hagenbach / DE
For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
Berliner Ring 2
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Former [2004/02]For all designated states
SAI Automotive SAL GmbH
Daimlerstrasse 1
76732 Wörth am Rhein / DE
For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
Berliner Ring 2
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
Sommer Allibert-Lignotock GmbH
Daimler Strasse 1
76732 Wörth am Rhein / DE
For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
Berliner Ring 2
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Former [2000/35]For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
Berliner Ring 2
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
Sommer Allibert-Lignotock GmbH
Daimler Strasse 1
76732 Wörth am Rhein / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kirchbaumer, Georg
Nussbaumweg 3
36251 Bad Hersfeld / DE
02 / Mayer, Wolfgang, Dr.
Forststrasse 24
75744 Wörth / DE
03 / Poweleit, Udo
Altmärkerstrasse 6
38465 Bromme / DE
[2000/40]
Former [2000/22]01 / Kirchbaumer, Georg
Nussbaumweg 3
36251 Bad Hersfeld / DE
02 / Mayer, Wolfgang, Dr.
Forststrasse 24
75744 Wörth / DE
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
Former [2000/22]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Kurfürstendamm 170
10707 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date99250388.803.11.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateDE199815527725.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19855277
[2000/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1004418
Date:31.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1004418
Date:04.10.2000
[2000/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1004418
Date:11.02.2004
Language:DE
[2004/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60R13/02, B29C41/22
[2000/40]
Former International [2000/22]B29C41/22, B60R13/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
TitleGerman:Innenverkleidungsteil für Kraftfahrzeuge und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[2000/22]
English:Interior liner for motor vehicles and method for making same[2000/22]
French:Revêtement intérieur de véhicules automobiles et procédé pour sa fabrication[2000/22]
Examination procedure08.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
11.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
09.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2003Fee for grant paid
20.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200103   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY11.02.2004
FI11.02.2004
IE11.02.2004
NL11.02.2004
DK11.05.2004
GR11.05.2004
SE11.05.2004
PT11.07.2004
AT03.11.2004
LU03.11.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]CY11.02.2004
FI11.02.2004
IE11.02.2004
NL11.02.2004
DK11.05.2004
GR11.05.2004
SE11.05.2004
AT03.11.2004
LU03.11.2004
Former [2006/13]FI11.02.2004
IE11.02.2004
NL11.02.2004
DK11.05.2004
GR11.05.2004
SE11.05.2004
AT03.11.2004
Former [2006/12]FI11.02.2004
IE11.02.2004
NL11.02.2004
DK11.05.2004
GR11.05.2004
SE11.05.2004
Former [2005/03]FI11.02.2004
IE11.02.2004
DK11.05.2004
GR11.05.2004
SE11.05.2004
Former [2005/02]FI11.02.2004
DK11.05.2004
GR11.05.2004
SE11.05.2004
Former [2004/41]FI11.02.2004
GR11.05.2004
SE11.05.2004
Former [2004/40]FI11.02.2004
SE11.05.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0718097  (PELZ ERNST EMPE WERKE [DE]) [A] 1,14 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 46; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE4035822  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,14 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 4; claims 3-5,7-9 *;
 [A]JPH0355218  ;
 [A]EP0517615  (ALLIBERT SA [FR]) [A] 1,14 * column 3, lines 53-58; figures 1-7; claim 5 *;
 [A]US5582789  (STEIN ARTHUR C [US], et al) [A] 1,14 * column 2, lines 39-43; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0103407  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19533367  (YMOS AG IND PRODUKTE [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2481210  (SOMMER EXPL [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5779262  (TOTANI CHIHARU [JP], et al) [A] 13 * figure 3 *;
 [A]US5803489  (NUSSHOER BERND [DE]) [A] 13 * figure 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910524), vol. 015, no. 203, Database accession no. (M - 1116), [A] 1,14 * abstract *
by applicantDE3932923