Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1069021

EP1069021 - Train control system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2007
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/03]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Müller, Bernd
Zuckerbergweg 44
38124 Braunschweig / DE
 [2001/03]
Application number, filing date99250408.419.11.1999
[2001/03]
Priority number, dateDE199815646426.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19856464
[2001/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1069021
Date:17.01.2001
Language:DE
[2001/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1069021
Date:18.09.2002
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1069021
Date:01.03.2006
Language:DE
[2006/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:B61L3/12, B61L3/24
[2001/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/03]
TitleGerman:Zugbeeinflussungssystem[2001/03]
English:Train control system[2001/03]
French:Système de commande de train[2001/03]
Examination procedure21.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/51]
06.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2005Fee for grant paid
19.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
18.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
21.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
IE01.03.2006
GR02.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
LU19.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]FI01.03.2006
IE01.03.2006
GR02.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
LU19.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2008/21]FI01.03.2006
IE01.03.2006
GR02.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2008/17]FI01.03.2006
IE01.03.2006
PT01.08.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2007/21]FI01.03.2006
IE01.03.2006
PT01.08.2006
Former [2006/36]FI01.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2633089  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE1438782  (LAGERSHAUSEN DR ING HERMANN) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP0551972  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-4 * the whole document *