Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1016434

EP1016434 - Cardiac pacemaker [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2007
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOTRONIK GmbH & Co. KG
Woermannkehre 1
12359 Berlin / DE
[2006/24]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
BIOTRONIK Mess- und Therapiegeräte GmbH & Co Ingenieurbüro Berlin
Woermannkehre 1
12359 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Nigam, Indra B.
6024 S.W. Jean Road, B-4
Lake Oswego, Oregon 97035 / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Lindner-Vogt, Karin L.
Biotronik SE & Co. KG
Woermannkehre 1
12359 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Lindner-Vogt, Karin L.
Biotronik GmbH & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1
12359 Berlin / DE
Former [2006/20]Lindner-Vogt, Karin L.
BIOTRONIK GmbH & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1
12359 Berlin / DE
Former [2000/27]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Pacelliallee 43/45
14195 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date99250442.317.12.1999
[2000/27]
Priority number, dateUS1998022075528.12.1998         Original published format: US 220755
[2000/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1016434
Date:05.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1016434
Date:04.04.2001
[2001/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1016434
Date:02.08.2006
Language:DE
[2006/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/368, A61N1/39
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [2002/01]
Former [2000/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Herztherapiegerät[2000/27]
English:Cardiac pacemaker[2000/27]
French:Stimulateur cardiaque[2000/27]
Examination procedure04.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/48]
14.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.2006Fee for grant paid
14.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
23.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0750921  (PACESETTER INC [US]) [Y] 1,2 * page 10, line 39 - page 12, line 38; figure - *;
 [YD]EP0538996  (TELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [YD] 1,2 * column W *;
 [A]US5183040  (NAPPHOLZ TIBOR A [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 19, line 31 - column 24, line 58 *;
 [AD]EP0360412  (INTERMEDICS INC [US]) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US5836971  (STARKWEATHER TIMOTHY J [US]) [AD] 1-9 * column W *
by applicantEP0580128
 EP0360412
 EP0538996
 US5836971