Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0933839

EP0933839 - Safety bulb holder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.06.2001
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.08.2001 [2001/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Light Years Ahead IPR Limited
11 Collier Way Stapleford
Cambridge CB2 5DZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/31]For all designated states
Light Years Ahead IPR Limited
11 Collier Way
Stapleford, Cambridge CB2 5DZ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Burn, Michael Rollin
Grove Farm House, Little Bealings
Woodbridge, Suffolk IP13 6LT / GB
[1999/31]
Representative(s)McNeight, David Leslie , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester
M2 3LG / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/31]McNeight, David Leslie , et al
McNeight & Lawrence Regent House Heaton Lane
Stockport Cheshire SK4 1BS / GB
Application number, filing date99300125.407.01.1999
[1999/31]
Priority number, dateGB1998000168228.01.1998         Original published format: GB 9801682
[1999/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0933839
Date:04.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0933839
Date:17.05.2000
[2000/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01R33/965
[2000/09]
Former International [1999/31]H01R33/975
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/04]
Former [1999/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Sicherheitsfassung[1999/31]
English:Safety bulb holder[1999/31]
French:Douille d'ampoule de sécurité[1999/31]
Examination procedure18.11.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/32]
08.03.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/32]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.12.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
21.12.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2337954  (BONNET ROBERT [FR]) [X] 1-7 * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 22; figures 1-10 *;
 [XA]WO8704867  (KUDOS LIGHTING LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2 * page 7, line 20 - page 20; figures 1-35 * [A] 10