blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0931671

EP0931671 - Method for adjusting drive roller linefeed distance [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.2006
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/47]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto
CA 94304 / US
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [1999/30]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Arquilevich, Dan
1634 NE Halsey Street
Portland, OR 97232 / US
02 / Rasmussen, Steve O.
9500 SE 13th Street
Vancouver, WA 98664 / US
03 / Stephens, Vance M.
20413 NE 163rd Circle
Brush Prairie, WA 98606 / US
[1999/30]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Carpmaels & Ransford
One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2002/30]Carpmaels & Ransford
43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [1999/30]Colgan, Stephen James, et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date99300310.218.01.1999
[1999/30]
Priority number, dateUS1998000932020.01.1998         Original published format: US 9320
[1999/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0931671
Date:28.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0931671
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0931671
Date:23.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2000
ClassificationIPC:B41J11/42, B41J11/46
[1999/30]
CPC:
B41J11/42 (EP,US); B41J11/008 (EP,US); B41J11/009 (EP,US);
B41J11/46 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/51]
Former [1999/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Anpassen des Antriebsroller-Zeilenvorschubs[1999/30]
English:Method for adjusting drive roller linefeed distance[1999/30]
French:Procédé pour ajuster la distance interligne d'avancement du rouleau d'entraînement[1999/30]
Examination procedure26.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
22.12.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2005Fee for grant paid
09.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03079057.0  / EP1410919
Opposition(s)24.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH0596796  ;
 [A]US5600350  (COBBS KEITH E [US], et al) [A] 7 * column 4, line 46 - line 65; figure 3 ** column 9, line 20 - line 42 *;
 [PX]WO9845119  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP], et al) [PX] 1,2;
 EP0925920  [ ] (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [ ] * abstract * * column 10, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * column 28, paragraph 39 - column 29, paragraph 12; figure 20 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930813), vol. 017, no. 439, Database accession no. (M - 1462), & JP05096796 A 19930420 (CANON INC) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.