Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0936622

EP0936622 - Magnetic memory devices having multiple magnetic tunnel junctions therein [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.08.2003
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.09.2003  [2003/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/40]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Former [1999/33]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Abraham, David William
67 Snowden Avenue
Ossining, New York 10562 / US
02 / Gallagher, William Joseph
577 Ashford Avenue
Ardsley, New York 10502 / US
03 / Trouilloud, Philip Louis
1171 Chedworth Circle
Mahwah, New Jersey 07430 / US
[1999/33]
Representative(s)Zerbi, Guido Maria
Intellectual Property Department
IBM United Kingdom Ltd.
Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/33]Zerbi, Guido Maria
Intellectual Property Department, IBM United Kingdom Ltd., Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date99300384.720.01.1999
[1999/33]
Priority number, dateUS1998002134210.02.1998         Original published format: US 21342
[1999/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0936622
Date:18.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0936622
Date:08.11.2000
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0936622
Date:02.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:G11C11/15, G11C11/16
[1999/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE [2001/30]
Former [1999/33]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Magnetische Speicheranordnungen mit einer Vielzahl magnetischer Tunnelverbindungen[1999/33]
English:Magnetic memory devices having multiple magnetic tunnel junctions therein[1999/33]
French:Dispositifs de mémoires magnétique incorporant plusieurs jonctions magnétiques de tunnel[1999/33]
Examination procedure17.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/25]
04.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2002Fee for grant paid
13.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US5640343  (GALLAGHER WILLIAM JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1,12,16,25 * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 29 * * column 3, line 45 - column 7, line 51 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0773551  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,12,16,25 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 31 * * column 8, lines 21-25 * * figures 1,12 *;
 [A]EP0411347  (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]) [A] 1,12,16,25 * page 1, lines 7-10,26,27,41-49 * * figure 1 *