Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0933343

EP0933343 - Method for producing sized, coated ceramic fibers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.06.2004  [2004/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COI CERAMICS, INC.
9617 Distribution Avenue
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2003/25]
Former [1999/31]For all designated states
DOW CORNING CORPORATION
3901 S. Saginaw Road
Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Blizzard, John Donald
1000 North Hampton Street
Bay City, Michigan 48708 / US
02 / Szweda, Andrew
1500 Settlers Passage
Midland, Michigan 48642 / US
03 / Wieber, Gary Michael
405 Adams Drive
Midland, Michigan 48642 / US
 [2002/28]
Former [1999/31]01 / Blizzard, John Donald
1000 North Hampton Street
Bay City, Michigan 48708 / US
02 / Szweda, Andrew
1500 Settlers Passage
Midland, Michigan 48642 / US
03 / Weiber, Gary Michael
405 Adams Drive
Midland, Michigan 48642 / US
Representative(s)Kyle, Diana , et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]Kyle, Diana , et al
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [1999/31]Kyle, Diana
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date99300456.321.01.1999
[1999/31]
Priority number, dateUS1998001569129.01.1998         Original published format: US 15691
[1999/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0933343
Date:04.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0933343
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/628, D01F11/00, C03C25/10
[2003/26]
Former International [1999/31]C04B35/628, D01F11/00, C03C25/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/15]
Former [1999/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von geschlichteten beschichteten keramischen Fasern[1999/31]
English:Method for producing sized, coated ceramic fibers[1999/31]
French:Procédé de fabrication de fibres revêtues ensimées[1999/31]
Examination procedure01.09.1999Examination requested  [1999/44]
18.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2003Fee for grant paid
19.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200305   M06   Fee paid on   11.03.2003
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP0243275  (SAINT GOBAIN VETROTEX [FR]) [X] 1,3,5-7,9-11,14,15 * claims 1,2,4,6-8,12-14 * * page 10, line 19 - line 22 * * example - * [A] 8 [Y] 2;
 [XA]EP0273812  (SAINT GOBAIN VETROTEX [FR]) [X] 1,5-7,9,11,14,15 * claims 1,6-8 * * column 3, line 35 - line 61 * * column 8, line 29 - line 65 * [A] 8,10;
 [X]US5079218  (TANAKA SABURO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,14 * claims 2,17,19 * * column 7, line 4 - line 6 *;
 [YA]EP0434501  (ONERA (OFF NAT AEROSPATIALE) [FR]) [Y] 2 * claim 1 * * page 4, line 24 - line 33 * [A] 1,16;
 [A]US5468318  (LEUNG ROGER Y [US], et al) [A] 1-4,16 * abstract * * column 9, line 18 - line 24 * * column 13, line 6 - line 9 *