blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0932189

EP0932189 - Inductor structure with air dielectric [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.01.2013
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.02.2013  [2013/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RAYTHEON COMPANY
870 Winter Street
Waltham MA 02451-1449 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/16]For all designated states
Raytheon Company
870 Winter Street
Waltham, Massachusetts 02451-1449 / US
Former [1999/30]For all designated states
Raytheon Company
141 Spring Street
Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Stacey, William F.
24 Mondamin Court
Somerville, Massachusetts / US
[1999/30]
Representative(s)Jackson, David Spence
Reddie & Grose LLP
16 Theobalds Road
London
WC1X 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/30]Jackson, David Spence
REDDIE & GROSE 16, Theobalds Road
London, WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date99300479.522.01.1999
[1999/30]
Priority number, dateUS1998001208322.01.1998         Original published format: US 12083
[1999/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0932189
Date:28.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0932189
Date:09.10.2002
[2002/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2002
ClassificationIPC:H01F17/00, H01L21/768, H01L21/02
[2012/16]
CPC:
H01L28/10 (EP,US); H01F17/0006 (EP,US); H01L21/7682 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1999/30]H01L21/3205, H01F27/28
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2003/27]
Former [1999/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Induktivität mit einem Luftdielektrikum[1999/30]
English:Inductor structure with air dielectric[1999/30]
French:Structure d'une inductance utilisant de l'air comme diélectrique[1999/30]
Examination procedure17.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/20]
14.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/06]
11.09.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2013/06]
Divisional application(s)EP08075521.8  / EP1975989
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.07.2003
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
19.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
15.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
14.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
14.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
22.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
14.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
11.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH0936312  ;
 [XY]JPH0936312  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 10 [Y] 1,2,4,6,8,11;
 [XY]US5874883  (UEMURA KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 10 * column 7, line 24 - line 27 * * column 10, line 18 - line 49; figures 6,7 * * column 10, line 60 - column 11, line 26; figures 8,9 * [Y] 1,2,11,2,4,6,8;
 [Y]EP0780853  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,6,8,11 * column 1, line 37 - line 40; figure 1 * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 5 *;
 [A]EP0684647  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 1-9,12-15 * figures 6-11 * * page 2, line 56 - page 3, line 12 * * page 4, line 6 - line 10 *;
 [A]US5370766  (DESAIGOUDAR CHAN M [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 8A-G,9 *;
 [A]EP0812016  (HARRIS CORP [US]) [A] 1-9 * figures 5-7,11-17 *;
 [A]US5652157  (HIRANO MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4,6,8 * figures 2H-N,35A-B *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09036312 A 19970207 (NEC CORP) [X] 10 * abstract * [Y] 1,2,4,6,8,11
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.