Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0933864

EP0933864 - Electronic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.04.2005  [2005/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Instruments Inc.
8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/30]For all designated states
Seiko Instruments Inc.
8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP
Former [1999/31]For all designated states
Seiko Instruments Inc.
8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP
For all designated states
Seiko Instruments R&D Center Inc.
8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 261 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshida, Yoshifumi, Seiko Instr. R&D Center Inc.
8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP
02 / Utsunomiya, Fumiyasu, Seiko Instr. R&D Center Inc.
8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP
[1999/31]
Representative(s)Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon
9 John Street
London
WC1N 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/31]Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street
London WC1N 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date99300630.328.01.1999
[1999/31]
Priority number, dateJP1998001539428.01.1998         Original published format: JP 1539498
JP1998003265016.02.1998         Original published format: JP 3265098
JP1998032382413.11.1998         Original published format: JP 32382498
[1999/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0933864
Date:04.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0933864
Date:30.08.2000
[2000/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP14.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02M3/156
[1999/31]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2001/20]
Former [1999/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektronisches Gerät[1999/31]
English:Electronic apparatus[1999/31]
French:Appareil électronique[1999/31]
Examination procedure22.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/12]
17.04.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/14]
03.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200103   M06   Fee paid on   14.05.2001
Documents cited:Search[X]US5565762  (ISHIKAWA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 5, line 45 - line 55; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0593257  (NEMIC LAMBDA KK [JP]) [A] 1-4;
 [A]US5598092  (OHTSUKA MASANORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4;
 [A]US5528087  (SIBATA YOSIMITU [JP], et al) [A] 1-4;
 [A]US5107138  (SEKI YOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4;
 [AP]US5831420  (MYERS RONALD GENE [US]) [AP] 1-4