Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0933222

EP0933222 - Optical printer head and optical printer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.01.2007
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.02.2007  [2007/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Futaba Denshi Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
629 Oshiba Mobara-shi
Chiba-ken / JP
For all designated states
NORITSU KOKI CO., LTD.
579-1 Umehara Wakayama-shi
Wakayama-ken 640-8550 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/31]For all designated states
Futaba Denshi Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
629 Oshiba
Mobara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
For all designated states
Noritsu Koki Co., Ltd.
579-1 Umehara
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama-ken 640-8550 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yukihiko, Shimizu
Futaba Denshi Kogyo K.K., 629 Oshiba
Mobara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
02 / Masao, Saito
Futaba Denshi Kogyo K.K., 629 Oshiba
Mobara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
03 / Kinya, Ueda
Futaba Denshi Kogyo K.K., 629 Oshiba
Mobara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
04 / Toshiaki, Nakahara
Futaba Denshi Kogyo K.K., 629 Oshiba
Mobara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
05 / Shigetaka, Nakamura
Noritsu Koki Co.,Ltd., 579-1 Umehara
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama-ken / JP
06 / Hiromichi, Morishima
Noritsu Koki Co.,Ltd., 579-1 Umehara
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama-ken / JP
07 / Toshihiro, Yamasaki
Noritsu Koki Co.,Ltd., 579-1 Umehara
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama-ken / JP
[1999/31]
Representative(s)Rees, David Christopher , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/31]Rees, David Christopher , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date99300753.302.02.1999
[1999/31]
Priority number, dateJP1998002104502.02.1998         Original published format: JP 2104598
[1999/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0933222
Date:04.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0933222
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/447
[1999/31]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/50]
Former [1999/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optischer Druckkopf und optischer Drucker[1999/31]
English:Optical printer head and optical printer[1999/31]
French:Tête d'impression optique et imprimante optique[1999/31]
Examination procedure14.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
06.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
28.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/07]
20.09.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2007/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4553148  (BEHRENS HERBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 1 - line 35; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]JPH01283169  ;
 [A]US5237347  (TESHIGAWARA TORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH09171101  ;
 []US5768023  (SAWAKI IPPEI [JP], et al) [ ] * column 53, line 64 - column 31, line 9; figures 24,25 *;
 [A]JPH05165108
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900202), vol. 014, no. 058, Database accession no. (M - 0930), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, [A] 3-5 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931014), vol. 017, no. 566, Database accession no. (P - 1629), [A] 3-5 * abstract *