Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0933690

EP0933690 - Apparatus for monitoring throughput [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.04.2001
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.06.2001 [2001/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Payne, Richard
Bale Hall Bale
Norfolk NR21 0QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/31]For all designated states
Payne, Richard
Bale Hall
Bale, Norfolk NR21 0QS / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/31]
Representative(s)Vleck, Jan Montagu
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/31]Vleck, Jan Montagu
Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date99300767.302.02.1999
[1999/31]
Priority number, dateGB1998000222202.02.1998         Original published format: GB 9802222
[1999/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0933690
Date:04.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0933690
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/418
[1999/31]
Designated contracting states[2000/52]
Former [1999/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Durchsatzüberwachung[1999/31]
English:Apparatus for monitoring throughput[1999/31]
French:Dispositif de surveillance de production[1999/31]
Examination procedure19.10.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/24]
22.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/24]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
24.11.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO9854599  (HAAGENSEN PETER [US]) [PX] 1-5,7-11,13 * column 6, line 26 - column 20, line 15; figures 1-3 *;
 [E]EP0910000  (WOHLENBERG BUCHBINDESYSTEME GM [DE]) [E] 1-6,8-12 * column 7, line 34 - column 15, line 53; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US5241482  (IIDA KOUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12 * column 3, line 66 - column 22, line 20; figures 1-21 *;
 [X]US5134574  (BEAVERSTOCK MALCOLM C [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-11 * column 3, line 53 - column 18, line 49; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]WO9325947  (ADERSA ASS POUR LE DEV DE L EN [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *