EP0941938 - Tamper resistant bottle cap and neck [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blackhawk Molding Co., Inc. 120 Interstate Road Addison, IL 60101 / US | [2005/03] |
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states Hidding, Walter E. Route 7-367A Woodrock Road Barrington Hills, Illinois 60010 / US | ||
For all designated states Hidding, Douglas J. 801 E. Lake Shore Drive, Tower Lakes Barrington Hills, Illinois 60010 / US | |||
For all designated states Hidding, Robert D. 925 Harper Drive Algonquin, Illinois 60102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hidding, Walter E. 2 Woodrock Road Barrington Hills, IL 60010 / US | 02 /
Hidding, Douglas J. 412 Caesar Drive Barrington Hills, IL 60010 / US | 03 /
Hidding, Robert D. 38W191 Binnie Lakes Trail West Dundee, IL 60118 / US | [2005/03] |
Former [1999/37] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Crouch, David John, et al Bromhead Johnson LLP 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | Crouch, David John, et al Bromhead & Co. 19 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 99300823.4 | 04.02.1999 | [1999/37] | Priority number, date | US19980018620 | 04.02.1998 Original published format: US 18620 | [1999/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0941938 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0941938 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0941938 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/34 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
B65D41/325 (EP,US);
B65D41/3409 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2001/37] |
Former [1999/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Originalitätsverschluss und Hals einer Flasche | [1999/37] | English: | Tamper resistant bottle cap and neck | [1999/37] | French: | Capsule inviolable et col pour une bouteille | [1999/37] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 28.06.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 11.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.08.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB809398 (FAPEX TRUST REG) [A] 3,5,15,23* page 2, line 36 - line 81; figures 1,2 *; | [XAY]US3980195 (FILLMORE WILLIAM E) [X] 1,20 * the whole document * [A] 6-8,13,14,16-18 [Y] 2,10,11,21,22,30-37; | [A]US4197960 (WALTER JOHN [US]) [A] 1,5,15,23 * figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]US4534479 (CONTI VINCENT N [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4930647 (DUTT HERBERT V [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,4 *; | [A]FR2665142 (CEBAL [FR]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 3; figure 1 *; | [YA]US5092478 (LA PIERRE MAURICE [CA]) [Y] 2,10,11,30-37 * column 3, line 46 - line 56; figure 4 * [A] 4; | [YA]US5385252 (HIDDING WALTER E [US], et al) [Y] 21,22,30-37 * the whole document * [A] 3,8,9,12,18,19,24-29 |