EP0936764 - Method and apparatus for calibration of digital down converters in a signal processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Litton Systems, Inc. 1840 Century Park East Los Angeles, CA 90067-2199 / US | [2006/24] |
Former [1999/33] | For all designated states Litton Systems 21240 Burbank Boulevard Woodland Hills, California 91367-6675 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Green, James D. 314 Fairhaven Court Newbury Park, California 91320 / US | 02 /
Ferraro, Eugène L. 2239 Grafton Street Simi Valley, California 93063 / US | 03 /
Hershman, Lawrence J. 20730 Vose Street Winnetka, California 91306 / US | [1999/33] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/33] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99300976.0 | 10.02.1999 | [1999/33] | Priority number, date | US19980021557 | 10.02.1998 Original published format: US 21557 | [1999/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0936764 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0936764 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | [2001/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0936764 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04J1/05, G01D18/00, H04B10/148 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
G01S3/82 (EP,US);
G01B21/00 (KR);
H04L27/0014 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0024 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/33] | H04J1/05, G01D18/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/08] |
Former [1999/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Kalibrierung von digitalen Frequenzumsetzern in einem Signalverarbeitungssystem | [1999/33] | English: | Method and apparatus for calibration of digital down converters in a signal processing system | [1999/33] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la calibration de convertiseurs de fréquences numériques dans un système de traitement de signal | [1999/33] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 26.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5493581 (YOUNG WILLIAM R [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 28 - line 54 * * column 2, line 1 - line 29 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0716516 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 3, line 24 - line 57 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]WO9723032 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 6 * * page 7, line 1 - line 28 * * page 9, line 8 - line 13 ** page 13, line 6 - page 14, line 12 * |