Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969278

EP0969278 - Dynamic strength tester for paper cores [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.08.2004  [2004/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sonoco Development, Inc.
125 West Home Avenue
Hartsville
South Carolina 29550 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/17]For all designated states
Sonoco Development, Inc.
125 West Home Avenue
Hartsville, South Carolina 29550 / US
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
SONOCO PRODUCTS COMPANY
One North Second Street
Hartsville South Carolina 29550 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Staples, John Freeman
155 Pineview Church Road
Blythewood, South Carolina 29016 / US
02 / Taylor, Dennis
209 Helsabeck Road
King, North Carolina 27021 / US
03 / van de Camp, Johannes W.
Humcovenderveld 14
6231 HW Meerssen / NL
04 / Lyles, Steve
402 Deerwood Drive
Hartsville, South Carolina 29550 / US
05 / Stephens, Jason T.
212 Kenwood Avenue
Hartsville, South Carolina 29550 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)MacDougall, Donald Carmichael , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow
G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]MacDougall, Donald Carmichael , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date99301013.111.02.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS1998010624329.06.1998         Original published format: US 106243
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969278
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969278
Date:19.12.2001
[2001/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969278
Date:03.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01N3/32, G01N33/34
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [2002/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gerät zur Messung der dynamischer Festigkeit von Papierkernen[2000/01]
English:Dynamic strength tester for paper cores[2000/01]
French:Appareil de test de la résistance dynamique de mandrins de papier[2000/01]
Examination procedure07.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/20]
28.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2003Fee for grant paid
27.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[DA]US4819488  (MOREL JEAN-MICHEL [FR]) [DA] 1,2,4-10,12 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 65; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]DE3320971  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 18 *;
 [A]EP0309123  (AHLSTROEM OY [FI]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 18; figure 1 *;
 [A]US3822588  (KNIGHT R, et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 27; figure 1 *
by applicantUS4819488