Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0939455

EP0939455 - Low cross talk connector configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.2003
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.08.2003  [2003/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/35]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Arnett, Jaime Ray
407 Oakham Place
Fishers, Indiana 46038 / US
02 / Pharney, Julian Robert
8386 Eastbay Drive
Indianapolis, IN 46326 / US
[1999/35]
Representative(s)Williams, David John , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London
WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/52]Williams, David John , et al
Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Former [1999/35]Johnston, Kenneth Graham , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB
Application number, filing date99301104.816.02.1999
[1999/35]
Priority number, dateUS1998003180727.02.1998         Original published format: US 31807
[1999/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0939455
Date:01.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0939455
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0939455
Date:14.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01R24/00
[2002/32]
Former International [1999/35]H01R23/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/40]
Former [1999/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Steckverbinder mit geringem Übersprechen[1999/35]
English:Low cross talk connector configuration[1999/35]
French:Connecteur à diaphonie minimale[1999/35]
Examination procedure14.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
30.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2002Fee for grant paid
11.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200103   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2001
Documents cited:Search[A]US4850887  (SUGAWARA NAOTO [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9642123  (BERG TECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0782221  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0598192  (KRONE AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0708501  (AT & T CORP [US]);
 [A]US4728299  (WORTH SIDNEY V [US])