Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0937868

EP0937868 - Oil filter fixing structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.09.2003  [2003/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
No.2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP
For all designated states
Tennex Corporation
13-5, Minami-ikebukuro 3-chome Toshima-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/34]For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
No.2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP
For all designated states
Tennex Corporation
13-5, Minami-ikebukuro 3-chome
Toshima-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Arita, Eriya
205-6, Fujikubo, Miyoshi-machi
Iruma-gun, Saitama / JP
02 / Tsuchiya, Kunihiko
1-12, Senzui 2-chome
Asaka city, Saitama / JP
03 / Yamada, Katsuya
845-1, Ohaza-koshikiya
Ageo city, Saitama / JP
04 / Yamamura, Hideki
692-19, Ohaza-kosamurai
Taku city, Saga / JP
05 / Matsunaga, Takeshi
59-23-B503, Hijiriyama 1-chome, Kounan-ku
Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP
[1999/34]
Representative(s)Godwin, Edgar James
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/34]Godwin, Edgar James
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date99301156.817.02.1999
[1999/34]
Priority number, dateJP1998003917020.02.1998         Original published format: JP 3917098
JP1998036985725.12.1998         Original published format: JP 36985798
[1999/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0937868
Date:25.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0937868
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:F01M11/03
[1999/34]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/18]
Former [1999/34]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ölfilterbefestigungstruktur[1999/34]
English:Oil filter fixing structure[1999/34]
French:Support pour le montage d'un filtre à huile[1999/34]
Examination procedure05.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/34]
24.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2002Fee for grant paid
26.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2309397  (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]) [A] 1-3 * page 4, line 2 - page 6, line 10; figure - *;
 [A]US5698098  (ERNST VOLKER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 10; figure - *;
 [A]EP0681094  (FRAM EUROP [GB]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 3; figure - *;
 [AP]EP0861682  (KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH [DE]) [AP] 1 * abstract *;
 [AP]EP0839563  (DENSO CORP [JP]) [AP] 1 * abstract *
ExaminationJPH09173716
by applicantJPH09173716