Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0939189

EP0939189 - Remote control door mechanisms [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.01.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.03.2003  [2003/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
P & D Group Services Ltd.
Unit 5A, Whitehall Industrial Park, Whitehall Road Great Bridge
West Midlands, DY4 7JU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/35]For all designated states
P & D Group Services Ltd.
Unit 5A, Whitehall Industrial Park, Whitehall Road
Great Bridge, West Midlands, DY4 7JU / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Pincher, Steven Charles
16 Richmond Gardens
Wombourne, Wolverhampton, WV5 0LG / GB
[1999/35]
Representative(s)Pearce, Anthony Richmond
Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham
B1 1TT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/35]Pearce, Anthony Richmond
MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date99301396.025.02.1999
[1999/35]
Priority number, dateGB1998000397126.02.1998         Original published format: GB 9803971
[1999/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0939189
Date:01.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0939189
Date:31.05.2000
[2000/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:E05F15/16, E05D15/44
[1999/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   IE,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/06]
Former [1999/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fernbedienungstürmechanismus[1999/35]
English:Remote control door mechanisms[1999/35]
French:Mécanisme de commande à distance pour porte[1999/35]
Examination procedure29.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
01.12.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
29.03.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GB
03.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/11]
08.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.01.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200103   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.2001
28.02.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]FR2624186  (MUELLER GUENTER [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * page 4, line 11 - page 8, line 2 * * page 8, line 17 - page 10, line 19; figures 1-3 * [Y] 4;
 [YA]GB2305466  (VEGA LTD [GB]) [Y] 4 * page 3, line 7 - line 12 * * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 18; figures 1,2,5 * [A] 3;
 [A]EP0524900  (BUBENDORFF RICHARD [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4472910  (IHA KIYOSHI [US]) [A] 4 * abstract *