Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0967389

EP0967389 - Injection indication apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.04.2005  [2005/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Assembly Technology & Test Limited
15 St. Botolph Street
London EC3A 7NJ / GB
[1999/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Mosen, Walter
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 24
56626 Andernach / DE
[1999/52]
Representative(s)Crouch, David John , et al
Bromhead Johnson
57-59 High Street
Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/52]Crouch, David John , et al
Bromhead & Co. 19 Buckingham Street
London WC2N 6EF / GB
Application number, filing date99301600.503.03.1999
[1999/52]
Priority number, dateGB1998000656726.03.1998         Original published format: GB 9806567
[1999/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0967389
Date:29.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0967389
Date:30.05.2001
[2001/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:F02M65/00
[1999/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/08]
Former [1999/52]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Anzeigeeinrichtung für die Einspritzung[1999/52]
English:Injection indication apparatus[1999/52]
French:Appareil d'indication d'injection[1999/52]
Examination procedure15.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/50]
01.12.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
08.04.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
01.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/14]
05.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.01.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
11.01.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2115884  (HARTRIDGE LTD LESLIE) [X] 1-3,6,12,13 * the whole document *