Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971339

EP0971339 - Method of recording/reproducing digital signal on magnetic recording medium through helical scanning by using read-after-write function and apparatus for carrying out the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.05.2002
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.06.2002  [2002/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AIWA CO., LTD.
2-11, Ikenohata 1-chome Taito-ku
Tokyo 110 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
AIWA CO., LTD.
2-11, Ikenohata 1-chome
Taito-ku, Tokyo 110 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Usui, Takumi
36-3 Tomatsuridai
Utsunomiya-shi / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Senior, Alan Murray
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Senior, Alan Murray
J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date99301660.905.03.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateJP1998019163207.07.1998         Original published format: JP 19163298
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971339
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971339
Date:04.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:G11B5/008, G11B5/53
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/38]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Aufzeichnung/Wiedergabe von Digitalsignalen auf einem magnetischen Aufzeichnungsträger mit schraubenförmiger Abtastung unter Verwendung einer "lesen-nach-schreiben" Funktion und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens[2000/02]
English:Method of recording/reproducing digital signal on magnetic recording medium through helical scanning by using read-after-write function and apparatus for carrying out the same[2000/02]
French:Méthode d'enregistrement/reproduction d'un signal digital sur un support d'enregistrement magnétique par balayage hélicoidal en utilisant une fonction de lecture après écriture et appareil de mise en oeuvre de cette méthode[2000/02]
Examination procedure19.03.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
24.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.12.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2001Fee for grant paid
15.03.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.04.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4002971  (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,6 * column 4, line 19 - line 33; figures 8,9 *;
 [A]DE3828020  (BROADCAST TELEVISION SYST [DE]) [A] 1,6 * column 2, line 34 - line 59; figure 2 *;
 [A]JPS6386105  ;
 [A]JPS63288492  ;
 [A]JPH04317283
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880902), vol. 012, no. 323, Database accession no. (P - 752), [A] 1,6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890317), vol. 013, no. 112, Database accession no. (P - 844), [A] 1,6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930325), vol. 017, no. 150, Database accession no. (E - 1339), [A] 1,6 * abstract *